FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 207112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £174
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dawn Margaret Davidson Trustee 06 December 2023
JOHN TUTHILL
Received: On time
SAXLINGHAM NETHERGATE CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
UPPER TAS VALLEY ALL SAINTS PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Recently registered
NEIL WARD Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
KAREN LOUISE DARRELL Trustee
None on record
BEVERLEY HERBERT ALLISON SPRATT Trustee
CHARITY OF SIR FRANCIS BOILEAU
Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
UPPER TAS VALLEY ALL SAINTS PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Recently registered
DENNIS WILFRID LUDKIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £319 £329 £174 £350 £174
Total expenditure £300 £265 £130 £200 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 October 2024 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 July 2023 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Elm View Cottage
The Green
Tacolneston
NORWICH
NR16 1EA
Phone:
01508481890
Website:

No information available