RELATE SOUTH DEVON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Couple, Individual and Family Counselling. Relate works to promote health, respect and justice in couple and family realtionships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 04 September 1962: Standard registration
- 04 December 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 December 2014: Funds transferred to 237035 Relationships Plymouth
- TORBAY AND DISTRICT MARRIAGE GUIDANCE COUNCIL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.63k | £104.95k | £75.02k | £66.48k | £67.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.13k | £94.58k | £89.58k | £82.94k | £72.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 18 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 15 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 26 March 2013 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 26 March 2013 | 54 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 27 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES (DATE OF ADOPTION NOT KNOWN)AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED 4TH JULY 1996 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; (2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS AND MARRIAGE AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC; (3) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE AND WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS.
Area of benefit
TORBAY AND SOUTH DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window