MARGARET DELABERE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 207202
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Management of Almshouses and associated endowment

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £14,596
Total expenditure: £43,440

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1962: Standard registration
  • 05 June 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN WILLIAMS Chair
None on record
Edward Roe Trustee 20 February 2019
None on record
Adriana Rogers Trustee 20 February 2019
None on record
CHRISTOPHER ROWBERRY Trustee
None on record
PHYLLIS PARDOE Trustee
INSTITUTE (CHADDESLEY)
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
THE CHADDESLEY CORBETT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £20.12k £20.15k £20.83k £19.64k £14.60k
Total expenditure £9.28k £10.73k £6.89k £8.04k £43.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DETERMINATION ORDER DATED 2ND APRIL 1908. U.V. 37 P. 9.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF FIVE WIDOWS OF THE ALMSHOUSES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CHADDESLEY CORBETT
Registration history
  • 21 June 1962 : Standard registration
  • 05 June 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Lodge Cottage
The Village
Chaddesley Corbett
Kidderminster
DY10 4SD
Phone:
01562777746
Website:

No information available