MUMFORD'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supply financial help to elderly farmworkers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 25 November 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 25 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1085900 AGE UK SUFFOLK
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32 | £33 | £33 | £33 | £35 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £70 | £30 | £30 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 19 June 2017 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 24TH JULY 1891 AND SCHEME OF 21ST MAY 1937
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED IN COAL TO EVERY ABLE-BODIED AGRICULTURAL LABOURER OCCUPYING A COTTAGE IN THE PARISH OF LITTLE CORNARD AND WORKING THROUGH THE HARVEST AND THE LATTER PART OF THE YEAR IN THE SAID PARISH. TO EVERY OTHER AGRICULTURAL LABOURER, WIDOW OR AGED PERSON OCCUPYING A COTTAGE AS ABOVE, A QUANTITY OF COAL.
Area of benefit
LITTLE CORNARD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window