LLOYD'S BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In house benevolent fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Kenneth Ohlson | Chair | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Harvey | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcella McLean | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shazia Deenally | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Philip Cooper | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ajay Gupta | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Groom | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES VERNON ASHFORD | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Sally Jane Coryn | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Patrick Aylward | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Sedgwick-Rough | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.89k | £334.00k | £302.00k | £433.00k | £419.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £523.27k | £453.00k | £361.00k | £451.00k | £387.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE FUND FOUNDED 1829 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND ARE TO ASSIST ALL THOSE WHO HAVE THE RIGHT, OR WHO HAVE HAD THE RIGHT, OF ENTRY TO LLOYD'S AND THEIR STAFFS AND DEPENDANTS OR OTHERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lloyd's Benevolent Fund
Lloyd's
One Lime Street
London
EC3M 7HA
- Phone:
- 02073276453
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window