Accounts and annual returns THE FRENCH CLINIC OTHERWISE DISPENSAIRE FRANCAIS

Charity number: 207234
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 21 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 27 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 03 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 03 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 30 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 28 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 28 September 2005 On Time