ROYAL SOCIETY OF WILDLIFE TRUSTS

Charity number: 207238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RSWT's objects are to promote the conservation and study of nature, the promotion of research into such conservation and to educate the public in understanding and appreciating nature, in the awareness of its value and in the need for conservation. The Society primarily does this by supporting the work of The Wildlife Trusts to restore 'A Living Landscape' and secure 'Living Seas'.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Isle Of Man
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 24 August 2022: Funds received from 1045167 THE WILDLIFE TRUSTS WALES LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSWT (Working name)
  • THE WILDLIFE TRUSTS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jane Chimbwandira Trustee 05 December 2024
HASLEMERE PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENTS' AND TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 1766 days
Nanret Senok Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Rosemary Grandage Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
David Robert Jordan Trustee 23 November 2023
Sand Dams Worldwide Limited
Received: On time
Prudence Addison Trustee 12 May 2023
None on record
Lara Burch Trustee 08 March 2023
AVON WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Robert Brown Trustee 31 January 2023
None on record
DUNCAN INGRAM Trustee 24 November 2022
WEST LONDON YMCA
Received: On time
YMCA St Paul's Group
Received: On time
LIVABILITY
Received: On time
Nina Ma Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
NICHOLAS SIMON PARSONS Trustee 25 November 2021
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Peter Batchelor Trustee 25 November 2021
None on record
Julian Woolford Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.86m £18.06m £18.58m £26.65m £32.73m
Total expenditure £17.70m £18.77m £17.18m £20.17m £28.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £12.95k N/A £70.17k
Income from government grants £1.23m £1.48m £1.07m N/A £150.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.43m £3.34m £3.14m £3.57m £3.67m
Income - Other trading activities £4.11m £3.21m £602.25k £589.58k £587.59k
Income - Charitable activities £13.22m £11.44m £14.78m £22.29m £28.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £111.65k £51.80k £43.48k £195.30k £450.29k
Income - Other £442 £15.32k £5.03k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £427.71k £994.98k £575.99k £387.30k £219.65k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.32m £18.34m £16.70m £19.55m £28.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £379.63k £432.69k £481.93k £619.18k £693.81k
Expenditure - Governance £109.36k £120.54k £186.06k £125.77k £156.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £12.28m £13.35m £10.14m £11.14m £18.44m
Expenditure - Investment management £7.99k £4.17k £6.43k £6.36k £6.40k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £284.52k £334.01k £211.70k £171.95k £252.55k
Long-term investments £1.08m £1.30m £1.75m £1.64m £1.79m
Other assets £14.85m £15.37m £15.44m £20.54m £29.28m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£504.33k -£324.46k £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £5.24m £6.65m £5.75m £4.43m £9.34m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE WILDLIFE TRUSTS
THE KILN
WATERSIDE
MATHER ROAD
NEWARK
NOTTINGH
Phone:
01636677711