DORKING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sheltered housing for residents in the Dorking area. Grants for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 February 1962: Standard registration
- 13 November 1995: Removed
- DORKING PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ROBERT KNOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Jane Mahony | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Richard Gowlland | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Butcher | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nick Wright | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret COOKSEY | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIA BROWN | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Turnbull | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID KINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.43k | £134.14k | £148.78k | £131.17k | £192.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.46k | £73.47k | £97.34k | £146.47k | £159.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 4 DECEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 13 DECEMBER 2006 AND TRUSTEE RESOLUTION DATED 16 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
1) ALMSHOUSES FOR ELDERLY PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE IN NEED WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF DORKING FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT, OR WHO FOR A SUBSTANTIAL PART OF THEIR LIFE HAVE LIVED IN THE SAID AREA. 2) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF DORKING WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF DORKING
Linked charities
- ALMSHOUSES ON COTMANDENE INCLUDING SUSANNA SMITH'S CHARITY
- CHARLES SPRATTEY
- ELLEN LOUISA TAYLOR
- H L GROUNDSELL
- HENRY SMITH
- JOHN ADEE CURTIS BEQUEST
- JOHN SANDERS'
- JOSEPH SANDERS
- K S CLARK
- LADY ELIZABETH JANE WATHEN'S BEQUEST
- LOIS UNWIN'S BEQUEST
- M A FLOOD
- MARGARET FENWICK
- R E FLOOD
- RENTCHARGE OUT OF POOR FOLK'S CLOSE
- RICHARD LOWNDES' GIFT
- SAMUEL COSEN
- THOMAS STILWELL'S BEQUEST
- THOMAS SUMMERS
- WILLIAM ANSELL
- WILLIAM HOLLIER
- WILLIAM HUTTON
- WILLIAM JAMES BISHOP
- 27 February 1962 : Standard registration
- 13 November 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Cotmandene
Dorking
RH4 2BL
- Phone:
- 01306881942
- Email:
- drkcharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window