HENRIETTA HAY CHARITY

Charity Number: 207271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides a small annual pension to elderly and needy pensioners in Ringmer and Glynde

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £138
Total expenditure: £210

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hazel Hobbs Trustee 09 November 2024
DAME BARBARA THOMAS AND SYBILLA STAPELEY'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Linda Grange Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Kim Stephanie King Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Angela Glaysher Trustee 12 February 2015
None on record
Jean Connell Trustee 19 January 2013
None on record
JENNIFER MARY HILL Trustee 23 February 2012
DAME BARBARA THOMAS AND SYBILLA STAPELEY'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GORDON JAMES FOWLIE Trustee 20 October 2010
None on record
ROSEMARY NORRIS Trustee 12 October 2010
None on record
VERONICA HUMPHREY Trustee 12 June 2009
DAME BARBARA THOMAS AND SYBILLA STAPELEY'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARTIN PILE Trustee 12 July 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26 £9 £0 £32 £138
Total expenditure £100 £101 £150 £200 £210
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39 THE FORGES
RINGMER
LEWES
BN8 5FA
Phone:
01273814791
Website:

No information available