TRUSTEES OF THE RECTORY OF ST SAVIOUR, SOUTHWARK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of the charity is to be applied in the defraying of the expenses of repair and maintenance of St Saviour's Church, Southwark and of other expenses connected with it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Southwark
Governance
- 17 August 1962: Standard registration
- 24 April 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £2.24k | £12.46k | £473 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.15k | £28.85k | £0 | £10 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 22 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 10 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 05 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ST SAVIOUR'S SOUTHWARK (CHURCH RATE ABOLITION) ACT 1883.
Charitable objects
PAYMENT OF THE STIPEND OF THE RECTOR OF ST SAVIOURS SOUTHWARK TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE EXPENSES OF REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR'S SOUTHWARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.