Financial history WEST HAM NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 207309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £111.36k £108.21k £93.24k £121.50k £137.20k
Total expenditure £91.17k £62.46k £84.38k £98.03k £117.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A