LEWES HOUSE OF FRIENDSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Warm, friendly premises where elderly members can join in activities or sit and chat. Tea, coffee and biscuits available during the day and reasonably priced lunches available Monday to Friday. Lip reading classes, exercises to music, groups organized by members, snooker room, one-to-one computer tuition, attractive garden, foot care specialist on premises weekly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 28 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1158437 LEWES HOUSE OF FRIENDSHIP
- HOUSE OF FRIENDSHIP (Working name)
- LEWES HOUSE OF FRIENDSHIP (Working name)
- (AGE CONCERN, LEWES) LEWES OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- AGE CONCERN LEWES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.76k | £62.26k | £52.24k | £66.65k | £73.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.35k | £65.85k | £54.49k | £74.85k | £93.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
02 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 11 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 31 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/1959 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/1971 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/1989 AS AMENDED ON 10/01/1995 AS AMENDED ON 16/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE WELLBEING OF OLDER PEOPLE, IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, IN AND AROUND LEWES (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE AREA OF BENEFIT”).
Area of benefit
LEWES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window