R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)

Charity number: 207314
Charity is in administration

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relate delivers via a national network a wide range of services to individuals and corporate bodies. Activities include: relationship counselling, sex therapy, family counselling, services for young people, mediation services, counselling in primary care settings, telephone counselling, Reveal online relationship assessment service, national email counselling service, education and learning, etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Germany

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 20 December 2019: Funds received from 1105903 RELATE WEST AND MID KENT
  • 18 November 2020: Funds received from 1111473 RELATE EAST KENT LTD
  • 29 January 2021: Funds received from 1096688 RELATE BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON
  • 29 January 2021: Funds received from 1071567 RELATE OXFORDSHIRE
  • 15 February 2021: Funds received from 1091414 RELATE, BRIGHTON, HOVE, EASTBOURNE, WORTHING AND D...
  • 13 May 2021: Funds received from 1100697 RELATE BROMLEY
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 1103163 RELATE PORTSMOUTH & DISTRICT
  • 20 May 2021: Funds received from 1105561 RELATE CYMRU
  • 13 July 2021: Funds received from 1067065 RELATE EXETER & DISTRICT
  • 13 July 2021: Funds received from 1068906 RELATE NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK
  • 13 July 2021: Funds received from 1080334 RELATE NORTH EAST
  • 13 July 2021: Funds received from 1055953 RELATE NORTHUMBERLAND AND TYNESIDE
  • 23 December 2021: Funds received from 1074509 RELATE BERKSHIRE LTD
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • RELATE CENTRAL OFFICE (Working name)
  • RELATE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ffion Griffith Chair 13 June 2023
None on record
Jeremy Gershon Tobias-Tarsh Trustee 25 March 2024
PHILIP KING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE D N AND C H TARSH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Jayne Hall Trustee 01 November 2023
The Relationship Therapy Centre
Received: On time
Mohammed Faizal Mead Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Ian David Pleace Trustee 09 June 2022
THE TRAMWAY MUSEUM SOCIETY
Received: On time
Mubeen Fazal Bhutta Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Debra Clark Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Daniel Peters Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Mauro Mortali Trustee 27 April 2020
None on record
Anthony Perryman Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
Michele Grant Trustee 06 November 2019
RELATE NORTH EAST LONDON
Received: On time
Malcolm Pearson Trustee 06 November 2019
RELATE BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
Matthew Robert Chaplin Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Patricia Whiteside Trustee 02 November 2017
RELATE NORTH EAST LONDON
Received: On time
WANSTEAD WI
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £10.15m £8.16m £8.42m £7.28m £7.58m
Total expenditure £9.65m £9.36m £8.36m £7.24m £7.30m
Income from government contracts £1.87m £1.05m £1.07m £954.00k £338.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £771.00k £38.00k £673.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.11m £174.00k £41.00k £52.00k £759.00k
Income - Other trading activities £619.00k £616.00k £206.00k £647.00k £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.43m £7.37m £8.18m £6.58m £5.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £2.00k £0 £0 £5.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £827.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £112.00k £0 £0 £759.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.65m £8.83m £7.85m £6.79m £6.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £149.76k £0 £32.00k £18.23k £51.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £521.00k £514.00k £454.00k £614.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Own use assets £1.06m £1.12m £752.00k £802.00k £1.17m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.24m £1.02m £1.98m £1.55m £1.39m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £932.00k £962.00k £1.49m £1.07m £990.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
F R P ADVISORY LLP
110 CANNON STREET
LONDON
EC4N 6EU
Phone:
02030054010
Website:

WWW.FRPADVISORY.COM