THE INCORPORATED SOCIETY FOR PSYCHICAL RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publication of informative journals. Operation of lending and reading library. Holding of lectures and conferences. Provision of education and advice. Award of grants in aid of research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 December 1962: Standard registration
- 17 January 1995: Removed
- SOCIETY FOR PSYCHICAL RESEARCH (Working name)
- SPR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR EMERITUS ADRIAN DAVID PARKER | Chair | 04 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
TyLean Tuijl | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Barlow Schofield | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ZOFIA WEAVER | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN PARSONS | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID VERNON | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr LIAM PAUL RUICKBIE | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr CALLUM ELLIOTT COOPER | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CIARAN FARRELL | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR GRAHAM KIDD | Trustee | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DEBORAH ERICKSON | Trustee | 18 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr BARRIE GEORGE COLVIN | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN BARTON | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MCLUHAN | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE ROUSSEAU | Trustee | 25 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN RYAN | Trustee | 25 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MURDIE | Trustee | 04 November 1999 |
|
|||||
Dr DAVID NICHOLAS ROUSSEAU | Trustee | 03 April 1997 |
|
|||||
Dr MELVYN JOHN WILLIN | Trustee | 03 April 1997 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS HARRY RUFFLES PHD | Trustee | 01 November 1990 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BERNARD JOHN CARR MA, PHD | Trustee | 04 April 1974 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CHRIS ROE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD STANLEY BROUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN FRASER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.62k | £103.18k | £431.42k | £112.51k | £117.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.57k | £220.86k | £235.18k | £226.50k | £276.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 August 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUG. 1895 NEW ARTICLES ADOPTED 23 FEB. 1955 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 1981 as amended on 27 Apr 2019 as amended on 27 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO SEEK, COLLECT, AND OBTAIN INFORMATION RESPECTING AND GENERALLY TO INVESTIGATE THE PHENOMENA COMMONLY KNOWN AS PSYCHICAL OR AS SPIRITUALISTIC INCLUDING HYPNOTISM, SOMNAMBULISM THOUGHT-TRANSFERENCE AND ALL MATTERS OF A KINDRED NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 31 December 1962 : Standard registration
- 17 January 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 VERNON MEWS
WEST KENSINGTON
LONDON
W14 0RL
- Phone:
- 02079378984
- Email:
- secretary@spr.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window