THE SCOTTISH HOSPITAL OF THE FOUNDATION OF KING CHARLES THE SECOND (ROYAL SCOTTISH CORPORATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of grants, allowances, housing and general advice and support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,049,109
Donations and legacies | £258.09k | |
Charitable activities | £1.47m | |
Other trading activities | £635 | |
Investments | £1.32m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,181,396
Raising funds | £298.87k | |
Charitable activities | £2.88m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £298.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.88m |
People

23 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
67 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- SCOTSCARE (Working name)
- THE ROYAL SCOTTISH CORPORATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Watson | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bart Preston | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheryl Louise Jermyn | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Brown | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ogilvie Close | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Callum Ross | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Gilmore | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David McMurtrie | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lynch | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lai Loong Daniel Tsang | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Guild | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74m | £2.71m | £2.63m | £2.73m | £3.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68m | £2.52m | £2.69m | £2.98m | £3.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £85.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £23.16k | £126.39k | £24.38k | £21.52k | £258.09k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £635 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.24m | £1.22m | £1.35m | £1.45m | £1.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.48m | £1.37m | £1.25m | £1.26m | £1.32m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.78k | £11.09k | £11.07k | £1.08k | £139.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.37m | £2.23m | £2.43m | £2.73m | £2.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £316.23k | £283.22k | £251.38k | £250.68k | £298.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £50.56k | £41.36k | £27.85k | £30.86k | £29.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £316.23k | £188.26k | £251.38k | £250.68k | £247.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £3.19k | £1.36k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.02m | £10.25m | £10.32m | £10.24m | £10.06m | |
|
Long-term investments | £38.42m | £45.42m | £46.54m | £43.90m | £47.53m | |
|
Other assets | £1.56m | £772.96k | £735.03k | £762.56k | £1.18m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £321.15k | £437.70k | £348.74k | £368.10k | £320.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTERS OF 1665, 1676, 1775 AND BYE-LAWS AND SCHEME OF THE 4 OCTOBER 1973 as amended by supplemental Charter 22 Dec 1982 as amended by supplemental Charter 01 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CORPORATION SHALL BE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT OR FOUND WITHIN A RADIUS OF 35 MILES OF CHARING CROSS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN SUCH WAYS THAT ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW, BEING PERSONS WHO WERE BORN IN SCOTLAND OR PERSONS ONE OF WHOSE PARENTS IN EACH CASE WAS BORN IN SCOTLAND OR WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND SURVIVORS OF CIVIL PARTNERSHIPS OF PERSONS WHO WERE BORN IN SCOTLAND OR WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND SURVIVORS OF CIVIL PARTNERSHIPS OF PERSONS ONE OF WHOSE PARENTS IN EACH CASE WAS BORN IN SCOTLAND.
Area of benefit
WITHIN A RADIUS OF 35 MILES OF CHARING CROSS
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Royal Scottish Corporation
22-24 City Road
London
EC1Y 2AJ
- Phone:
- 02072403718
- Email:
- info@scotscare.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window