FRIENDS OF KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the charity is to raise funds to provide amenities and comforts for the benefit of patients and staff at King's College Hospital NHS Foundation Trust. We provide furniture and curtains for the wards as well as help with the purchase of medical equipment and supporting outpatient waiting areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Lloyd | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Reynolds | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE COTTAGE | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Martin | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Castle | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Regina Hearnden | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Enid Kemp | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROWENNA MARGARET HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.53k | £95.72k | £50.00k | £52.04k | £77.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.92k | £21.32k | £74.40k | £83.57k | £178.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE ASSOCIATION AND ARTICLES OF CONSTITUTION DATED 7TH APRIL 1998 AMENDED ON 28TH APRIL 2004 as amended on 17 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT,DISABLED,HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM,AND TO ASSIST IN THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL;IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF EXTRA COMFORTS AND AMENITIES FOR PATIENTS AND STAFF AT KINGS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT THE KINGFISHERS ARE THE YOUNG FRIENDS OF KINGS WHO UNDER A SEPARATE COMMITTEE PROVIDE COMFORTS,AMENITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE CHILDREN'S FACILITIES IN KINGS,AND ARE ACCOUNTABLE TO THE FRIENDS MAIN COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL
DENMARK HILL
LONDON
SE5 9RS
- Phone:
- 02032993370
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window