MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON CHARITY

Charity number: 207342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To offer pensions to those of state pension age, there may be exceptions slightly below that age, who have lived or worked within the City of London for a minimum of 5 years. To offer grants to charities in the City of London, or with a connection to the City of London. The 'City' is the 'square mile', almost all EC3, EC4, small area of EC1, EC2 - not Greater London.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £94,324
Total expenditure: £92,720

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Anne King Trustee 18 March 2025
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dan Rogers Trustee 20 June 2023
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Jane Pearson Trustee 20 September 2022
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Abimbola Jubril Anthony Trustee 16 March 2021
None on record
Marcus Huntley Trustee 16 March 2021
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Sarah Ann Filson Trustee 26 November 2019
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Jennifer Brown Trustee 01 September 2019
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
INTOUNI
Received: On time
Christopher Lintott Trustee 18 September 2018
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Alan Robert Bird Trustee 06 March 2018
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Emma Martin Trustee 28 November 2017
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
IAN CHRISTOPHER NORMAN Seaton MBE Trustee 13 June 2017
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE CITY CHAPTER AND PERCY TRENTHAM CHARITY
Received: On time
ST LAWRENCE JEWRY GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL
Received: On time
Helen Mulcahy Trustee 17 March 2015
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARIANNE BERNADETTE FREDERICKS Trustee 30 October 2012
CHRIST'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PAMELA BEEVERS BA, MA Trustee 30 October 2012
MITCHELL CITY OF LONDON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.94k £88.22k £90.13k £92.31k £94.32k
Total expenditure £64.00k £67.47k £128.17k £65.17k £92.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Eastfield
Mill Lane
North Dalton
DRIFFIELD
YO25 9BF
Phone:
07392475382
Website:

No information available