Northampton Huntingdon & Bedford Mark Benevolent Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To afford assistance to needy brethren, their widows or immediate relatives by means of grants. Also to assist other local charities and worthy causes. To aid our members to subscribe to the funds of any registered charity but primarily to the Mark Benevolent Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- City Of London
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 28 June 1962: Standard registration
- Northampton Huntingdon and Bedford Mark Benevolent Association (Working name)
- NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND HUNTINGDONSHIRE MARK BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Snape | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Richard King | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Arnold Davison | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID SOWERBY | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.22k | £20.83k | £38.76k | £22.07k | £21.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.79k | £9.43k | £15.97k | £16.81k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BY-LAWS ADOPTED 3RD MAY 1962 AS AMENDED 12TH DECEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED ON 24 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUN 2022 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A FUND (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE FUND) TO WHICH ITS MEMBERS MAY SUBSCRIBE AND FOR THE FUND OR ANY PART THEREOF TO BE PAID OR APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES AS CONSTITUTED IN BY-LAW 4, FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES, NAMELY: - A) TO MAKE GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF MARK MASTER MASONS, WHO ARE SUBSCRIBING MEMBERS OF MARK LODGES OR OF ROYAL ARK MARINER LODGES IN THE MARK PROVINCE OF NORTHAMPTON, HUNTINGDON AND BEDFORD, OR THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS, SISTERS, CHILDREN OR GRANDCHILDREN BEING IN EVERY CASE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. B) TO MAKE GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF FORMER MARK MASTER MASONS WHO WERE PREVIOUSLY SUBSCRIBING MEMBERS OF THE SAID MARK PROVINCE, OR OF THE FORMER MARK PROVINCE OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND HUNTINGDONSHIRE, OR OF THE FORMER MARK PROVINCE OF BEDFORDSHIRE, AND WHO HAD MAINTAINED A MEMBERSHIP OF THE ORDER FOR 15 YEARS OR MORE. C) TO MAKE DONATIONS TO ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITIES, NAMELY: - THE GRAND LODGE OF MARK MASTER MASONS FUND OF BENEVOLENCE (THE “MARK BENEVOLENT FUND”). - THE MASONIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION OF THE UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND. - OTHER TRUSTS OR BODIES, ESTABLISHED EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AND REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION, PROVIDING SERVICES IN ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE COUNTIES FALLING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE MARK PROVINCE OF NORTHAMPTON, HUNTINGDON AND BEDFORD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Denford Road
Ringstead
KETTERING
NN14 4DF
- Phone:
- 01933623162
- Email:
- jeffchambers77@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window