PROVIDENCE ROW CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDENCE ROW CHARITY IS THE UNINCORPORATED PREDECESSOR TO THE INCORPORATED CHARITY PROVIDENCE ROW (1140192). PROVIDENCE ROW CHARITY CONTINUES IN EXISTENCE TO HOLD THE CHARITY'S PERMANENT ENDOWMENT AND TO RECEIVE ANY LEGACIES BEQUEATHED TO PROVIDENCE ROW CHARITY AFTER 31 MARCH 2011. FOR DETAILS OF CURRENT ACTIVITIES SEARCH UNDER PROVIDENCE ROW (1140192).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of London
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- PROVIDENCE (ROW) NIGHT REFUGE AND HOME (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROVIDENCE ROW | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 21/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/04/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (2) THE COMMITTEE MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 14 February 1963 : Standard registration
- 25 June 1998 : Removed
- 25 June 1998 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
PROVIDENCE ROW
DELLOW CENTRE
82 WENTWORTH STREET
LONDON
E1 7SA
- Phone:
- 02074226382
- Email:
- info@providencerow.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window