ROWLAND HILL MEMORIAL AND BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports current and former Royal Mail Group Ltd and Post Office Ltd employees. We provide one-off financial grants for those facing unexpected financial difficulties, life-changing health challenges or homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- ROWLAND HILL FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DALE THOMAS HADDON | Chair | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Bradshaw | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Elaine Martin | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodney James Jagelman | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Alexander | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Malcolm McKnight | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ms Mel Tomlin | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Paul Davis | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BLAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOSEPH POOLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £565.17k | £1.38m | £559.83k | £589.82k | £417.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £682.64k | £1.16m | £673.36k | £590.20k | £510.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £420.97k | £1.32m | £520.64k | £500.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £86.94k | £45.38k | £21.42k | £78.07k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £42.68k | £398 | £48 | £1.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £14.58k | £15.89k | £17.73k | £9.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.50k | £162.91k | £96.51k | £57.33k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £582.86k | £980.15k | £566.01k | £482.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £99.78k | £180.35k | £107.35k | £107.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £49.43k | £45.70k | £48.11k | £50.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £40.91k | £48.21k | £52.97k | £53.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2023 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/06/1882 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE POST OFFICE AND THEIR WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF POVERTY, AGE, OR INFIRMITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 08 February 2010 : Removed
- 08 February 2010 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowland Hill Fund
Royal Mail
185
Farringdon Road
London
- Phone:
- 0345 600 4586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window