Financial history THE GURDJIEFF SOCIETY

Charity Number: 207480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £387.09k £154.44k £178.49k £234.08k £328.14k
Total expenditure £218.04k £203.65k £193.41k £175.09k £209.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A