Trustees THE GURDJIEFF SOCIETY

Charity number: 207480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LAURENCE JOHN MORROCCO Chair
None on record
Vergine Gulbenkian Trustee 16 January 2025
MIHRAN ESSEFIAN CHARITABLE TRUST (ALSO KNOWN AS THE MIHRAN AND AZNIV ESSEFIAN CHARITABLE TRUST)
Received: On time
THE BENLIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew Brenner Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Anthony Mitchell Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Sarah Wood Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Sara Bethge Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Margareta Planidin Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Dietrich Bethge Trustee 06 December 2017
None on record
Murray Planidin Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
Christopher Glanville Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
Antony Gibbs Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
JAMES CONNELL Trustee 13 October 2004
None on record
ANNETTE COURTENAY-MAYERS Trustee 06 October 1955
None on record
RICHARD CHARTIER CARNAC TEMPLE Trustee
None on record
NATASHA JOBST Trustee
None on record