THE J G GRAVES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 22 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS DONA WOMACK | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Susan Mary Greaves | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Katie Rose Hayward | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Steven Paul Cotton | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Professor Solomon Tesfaye | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Gavin Jon Richards | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Adrian Thomas Graves | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Kim Streets | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
RODERICK PLEWS | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
CLLR JACQUELINE DRAYTON | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
PETER PRICE MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
JOHN CLIVE BRAMAH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.69k | £171.00k | £178.26k | £185.48k | £240.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.90k | £182.00k | £199.10k | £214.85k | £218.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH AUGUST 1930 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02 JUL 1934 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
(A) PROVISION OF PARKS AND OPEN SPACES, LIBRARIES AND ART GALLERIES. (B) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SCIENCE. (C) THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE SICK AND THE POOR. (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BHP
Chartered Accountants
2 Rutland Park
Sheffield
- Phone:
- 01142667171
- Email:
- rachel.heath@bhp.co.uk
- Website:
-
jggravescharitabletrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window