THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT OGILBY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For benefit of officers and other ranks of the London Scottish Regiment, for benefit of the charitable objects of the charities of the regiment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- THE LONDON SCOTTISH OGILBY TRUST (THE OGILBY TRUST) (Previous name)
- THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT (THE GORDON HIGHLANDERS) OGILBY TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79k | £6.37k | £6.83k | £5.13k | £15.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £13.69k | £2.19k | £4.54k | £18.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1954 AND SCHEME OF 9TH AUGUST 1993.
Charitable objects
1. FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE OFFICERS OR MEN, WHETHER REGULAR OR TERRITORIAL, OF THE REGIMENT OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE REGULAR OFFICERS OR MEN ATTACHED TO THE REGIMENT ON PERMANENT STAFF DUTIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE GIVEN EXCEPTIONAL SERVICE TO THE REGIMENT. 2. FOR ANY OF THE OBJECTS OF A CHARITABLE NATURE OF THE EXISTING CHARITIES OF THE REGIMENT. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1954.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window