BARKINGSIDE DISABILITY THURSDAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a social club for members and giving them opportunities to have a greater interaction with the general public by arranging regular outings to the coast and theatre.also trips to other venues and zoos
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redbridge
Governance
- 10 December 1969: Standard registration
- I R D S A (Working name)
- ILFORD ROMFORD AND DISTRICT SPASTICS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH ATKIN BAILEY CHAIRMAN | Chair | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TINA GRAYSON | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARK GREEN TREASURER | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVE KRISMON DAVE | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
colin lachman colin | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN BAILEY | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVE LUCKINS | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.00k | £20.00k | £20.19k | £34.43k | £38.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.00k | £8.00k | £13.40k | £16.95k | £42.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 1962 AS AMENDED ON 6 DECEMBER 1967, 10 MAY 1969, 5 JULY 2007 AND 22 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, CAUSE TO BE PROVIDED OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND WELFARE OF ANY PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY AND TO INCLUDE ANY MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSON. TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS WHO ARE IN NEEDY CIRCUMSTANCES. TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT OR APPARATUS FOR MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
REDBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ilford Romford & District Spastics Association
Irdsa Hall
Craven Gardens
ILFORD
Essex
IG6 1PS
- Phone:
- 07769897283
- Email:
- marklgreen64@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
marklgreen64@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window