Financial history SPROWSTON SENIOR CITIZENS WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 207506
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £26.23k £23.63k £23.64k £24.05k £26.42k
Total expenditure £21.63k £9.70k £24.77k £25.79k £26.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.00k N/A N/A