CHURCH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Receives land rental monies which are then divided between the Education Fund, which gives out grants for educational purposes, and the Church Fund for preservation of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 06 July 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.94k | £9.97k | £11.51k | £38.44k | £14.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94k | £9.97k | £11.51k | £38.44k | £12.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHANCERY SCHEME OF THE 7TH JUNE 1855 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF THE 9TH AUGUST 1887 AND THE 15TH MAY 1963. DETERMINATION ORDER OF THE 27TH SEPTEMBER 1904
Charitable objects
THE REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF BURWELL.
Area of benefit
BURWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 MYRTLE DRIVE
BURWELL
CAMBRIDGE
CB25 0AJ
- Phone:
- 01638743556
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window