SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS

Charity number: 207585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Applicants must live in the inner London boroughs and must make their application through the social services, a charity, an organisation or similar body.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £52,905
Total expenditure: £44,025

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SRD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN HAMMOND McCULLOCH Chair
SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF FOREIGNERS IN DISTRESS
Received: On time
THE PAMELA MATTHEWS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Megan van der Linde Trustee 21 June 2019
SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF FOREIGNERS IN DISTRESS
Received: On time
Olivia Petri Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
ISABEL PETRI Trustee 17 January 2018
None on record
LOUISE OXLEY Trustee 13 December 2017
None on record
Florence Petri Trustee 14 May 2017
None on record
JAMES PETRI Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record
CHARLES PETRI Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE ARMSTRONG Ms Trustee
THE NOTTING HILL PREP FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE KEPPLEWRAY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.54k £35.19k £37.87k £47.47k £52.91k
Total expenditure £23.73k £41.63k £35.43k £40.60k £44.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 HARTSWOOD ROAD
LONDON
W12 9NE
Phone:
020 7371 8544
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available