Financial history ST BRIDE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 207607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £787.09k £560.77k £742.89k £842.96k £1.47m
Total expenditure £872.17k £718.27k £894.10k £1.02m £937.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £159.96k £26.66k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £88.95k £101.55k £42.26k £16.38k £631.59k
Income - Other trading activities £419.62k £154.25k £291.58k £418.26k £394.88k
Income - Charitable activities £164.92k £50.17k £285.95k £313.92k £356.67k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £113.61k £94.83k £96.46k £94.40k £91.18k
Income - Other £0 £159.96k £26.66k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £575.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £409.01k £344.27k £544.84k £561.59k £399.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds £463.17k £374.00k £349.26k £455.12k £538.50k
Expenditure - Governance £39.14k £21.45k £23.39k £25.98k £29.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.33k £27.20k £28.19k £23.40k £21.43k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0