Financial history FRIENDS OF CLACTON HOSPITAL

Charity number: 207643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.93k £1.59k £1.95k £4.91k £10.66k
Total expenditure £17.59k £43.11k £8.02k £6.24k £16.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A