FRIENDS OF CLACTON HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising consists of hospital retail shop. We run various raffles and receive funds from collection boxes placed in retail shops in the area. We also hold a Christmas raffle and bazaar. We also obtain funds from the sale of donated goods. Additional fund raising events are held from time to time as and when decided on by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- CLACTON HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY FRIENDS (Previous name)
- CLACTON HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- CLACTON HOSPITALS LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Coral Montgomery | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Edwards | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ROCKALL | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANICE SMITH | Trustee | 01 December 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.93k | £1.59k | £1.95k | £4.91k | £10.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.59k | £43.11k | £8.02k | £6.24k | £16.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECTS AND RULES ADOPTED 22ND JANUARY 1949 AS AMENDED ON 25TH JUNE 1999 AND 9 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE SPIRIT AND ACTIVITIES FO VOLUNTARY SERVICE TO PROVIDE FUNDS TO SUPPLY ANYTHING IN THE GENERAL INTEREST OF PATIENTS AND STAFF AND THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL IN CLACTON AND DISTRICT AND THE AFTER CARE OF PATIENTS AND OTHER NECESSITOUS CASES.
Area of benefit
CLACTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Tapsworth Close
CLACTON-ON-SEA
Essex
CO16 8UF
- Phone:
- 01255429915
- Email:
- janray9@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window