Trustees NIGHTINGALE CHARITY FOR POOR
Charity number: 207674

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Rigby | Chair | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH KIM DANIELS MRS | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BUTCHER | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANN SWAN | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
PAM BROWN BROWN | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE BLYTH | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL RUTH WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.