Financial history NORTH HALL

Charity Number: 207700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £31.19k £23.28k £44.40k £46.20k £62.73k
Total expenditure £39.07k £25.84k £26.34k £31.94k £57.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £20.58k £12.45k N/A N/A