HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY (TOLLESHUNT D'ARCY ESTATE)

Charity Number: 207722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To manage property vested in it being Whitehouse Farm in the parish of Tolleshunt D'arcy Essex. To distribute residue after expenses of management into 140 equal parts between the Ancient parishes of Suffolk, Essex, Hertford, Chester and Sussex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £82,375
Total expenditure: £93,686

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Essex
  • Hertfordshire
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • HENRY SMITHS CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES NICHOLAS GOOCH Chair
THE PERRY WATLINGTON TRUST
Received: On time
Ben Fisher Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
Claire Fisher Trustee 06 June 2018
JONATHAN PARKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 30 days late
FAULKBOURNE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
ROBERT CHARLES MALDEN Trustee
None on record
DAVID FLEMING Trustee
None on record
CHRIS BUTLER Trustee
CHILDREN'S PLAYING FIELD
Charity reporting is overdue by 1665 days
CLAIRE COTTRELL DL Trustee
THE PERRY WATLINGTON TRUST
Received: On time
ESSEX YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.87k £55.11k £38.23k £84.42k £82.38k
Total expenditure £58.83k £15.53k £72.27k £64.21k £93.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bright & Sons
West House
West Square
MALDON
Essex
CM9 6HA
Phone:
01621 852323
Website:

No information available