ST BERNARD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 207727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve women who are in need of financial assistance in sickness, convalescence or old age of themselves, their spouses or dependents

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £38,046
Total expenditure: £44,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST BERNARD'S CHARITY FOR GENTLEWOMEN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN EDWARD PUTTOCK Chair
BOOKS ALIVE
Received: On time
B.H. CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST
Received: On time
THE CRESCENT HOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP HANNINGTON MEMORIAL CHURCH, HOVE
Emma Martyr Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
Nigel Sarjudeen Trustee 06 July 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOP HANNINGTON MEMORIAL CHURCH, HOVE
Vicky Hiscox Trustee 15 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £33.41k £35.36k £35.08k £38.27k £38.05k
Total expenditure £34.38k £34.37k £48.81k £44.20k £44.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 12 MAY 1928 AND ORDER OF COURT OF CHANCERY DATED 8 FEBRUARY 1934
Charitable objects
FOR PURPOSES OF THE ST BERNARD'S CHARITY FOR GENTLEWOMWEN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 18 January 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
69 New Church Road
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 4BA
Phone:
01273281332
Website:

No information available