THE METROPOLITAN DRINKING FOUNTAIN AND CATTLE TROUGH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide overseas aid for water based projects such as building bore holes or providing elephant pumps, irrigation for villages and water troughs for animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- India
- Thailand
- Uganda
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 29 May 1993: Removed
- THE DRINKING FOUNTAIN ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MILLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul O'Connell | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK SLATER | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Laura Erith | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ELLIOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOPHIE FULLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ralph Baber | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALDERMAN SIR MICHAEL BEAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alastair King | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.82k | £39.18k | £44.49k | £46.31k | £49.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.45k | £19.44k | £22.63k | £32.72k | £21.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JULY 1960 AS AMENDED 28 SEPTEMBER 1964 AND 19 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF PURE DRINKING WATER FOR PEOPLE AND ANIMALS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. (2) THE PRESERVATION OF THE ASSOCIATION'S DRINKING FOUNTAINS, CATTLE TROUGHS AND OTHER INSTALLATIONS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Linked charities
- A LADY (ANONYMOUS)
- A LLOYD
- AIMEE CONSTANCE ANNE LOWTHER
- HERBERT ARTHUR STEPHENSON
- JAMES STEWART HENDERSON
- JOSEPH COATES
- LADY HAMILTON
- LYNDHURST DRINKING FOUNTAIN TRUST
- MISS ELLEN MARKLAND
- MISS HANNAH MARRIOTT
- MISS JULIA EMILY GORDON
- MISS MARIA (OR MAY) GETHIN
- MRS EMILY DOWLING
- MRS LAURA MARY FIELDER
- MRS MARIAN BEHREND
- MRS MARIANNE SOPHIE HANSLER
- REARDON MEMORIAL FUND
- RICHARD BARLOW KENNETT
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 29 May 1993 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Queenborough Gardens
Chislehurst
BR7 6NP
- Phone:
- 02084671261
- Website:
-
drinkingfountains.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window