SHRIVENHAM UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 207756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Shrivenham United Charities comprises Martens Trust Almshouses providing accommodation for 6 appointed almspersons and Garrards Charity providing grants for tools or books to apprentices or young or disabled people who going on to further education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,427
Total expenditure: £27,105

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SHRIVENHAM ALMSHOUSES TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Mackarness Trustee 25 February 2023
VISCOUNTESS BARRINGTON'S HOMES FOR DISABLED EX-SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN
Received: On time
VISCOUNTESS BARRINGTON HOMES FOR DISADVANTAGED EX-SERVICE PERSONNEL CIO
Recently registered
Julia Jones Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Erica Jane Crabtree Trustee 21 September 2016
THE SOCIETY OF RECORDER PLAYERS
Received: On time
Caroline Dawson Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.29k £14.45k £12.55k £14.23k £18.43k
Total expenditure £7.33k £12.83k £21.11k £7.23k £27.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 13 OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT
Area of benefit
ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF SHRIVENHAM
Registration history
  • 09 July 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
14 Damson Trees
Shrivenham
Swindon
SN6 8BB
Phone:
01793782125
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available