SUTTON'S HOSPITAL IN CHARTERHOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides accommodation and care for defined categories of men and women (the Brothers) in its historic buildings in Charterhouse Square in the City of London. It also provides financial support to Charterhouse School and has the power to operate a museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,176,000
Donations and legacies | £142.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.31m | |
Other trading activities | £727.00k | |
Investments | £3.00m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,585,000
Raising funds | £1.32m | |
Charitable activities | £4.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,485,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.26m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.26m | |
Retained for future use | £1.08m |
People

75 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 November 1962: Standard registration
- 16 April 1996: Removed
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmett Steed-Mundin MSc CMgr | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Prior MA | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILKINSON MSc BSc | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rolfe | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Flora Lyon | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
William Naunton | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sufina Ahmad | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Caroline Abrahams | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kate McLeod | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Cunningham | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL HARDING | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID FARNSWORTH | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Munns | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wilf Weeks | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/03/2020 | 25/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79m | £4.47m | £4.92m | £4.82m | £5.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.03m | £5.05m | £5.58m | £5.41m | £5.59m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £270.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £829.41k | £322.00k | £165.00k | £149.00k | £142.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £642.00k | £203.00k | £609.00k | £691.00k | £727.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.11m | £0 | £0 | £1.22m | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £322.00k | £165.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.89m | £2.58m | £2.87m | £2.76m | £3.00m | |
|
Income - Other | £322.83k | £1.36m | £1.27m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £408.00k | £0 | £0 | £48.00k | £2.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.67m | £3.91m | £4.36m | £4.04m | £4.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.36m | £1.14m | £1.21m | £1.37m | £1.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £312.15k | £0 | £295.00k | £181.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £476.83k | £448.00k | £524.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £761.60k | £504.00k | £630.00k | £632.00k | £558.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 25/03/2020 | 25/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.69m | £7.70m | £7.89m | £7.70m | £7.70m | |
|
Long-term investments | £101.81m | £107.01m | £108.07m | £110.93m | £112.42m | |
|
Other assets | £3.64m | £3.23m | £2.57m | £2.02m | £1.68m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.51m | £1.57m | £1.78m | £1.69m | £1.76m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 08 DEC 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06 APR 2017 as amended on 17 Mar 2022 as amended on 16 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (1) IN THIS CLAUSE, “BENEFICIARIES” MEANS SINGLE PERSONS (WHO CAN BE WIDOWS, WIDOWERS OR UNMARRIED) OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND WHO, UNLESS THE GOVERNORS OTHERWISE DECIDE IN ANY INDIVIDUAL CASE: (A) ARE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE; AND (B) ARE, OR HAVE BEEN, OFFICERS IN ANY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN, CLERGY, MERCHANTS OR PERSONS ENGAGED IN PUBLIC SERVICE OR IN TRADING, PROFESSIONAL, AGRICULTURAL OR SIMILAR OCCUPATIONS. (2) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF BENEFICIARIES BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND CARE OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE GOVERNORS THINK FIT; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE SCHOOL (BUT ONLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ‘USE OF INCOME’ CLAUSE 29(1)(C) OF THE PRINCIPAL SCHEME). (3) THE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE APPOINTED TO ACCOMMODATION IN THE HOSPITAL MAY BE KNOWN AS “BROTHERS” AND/OR SUCH OTHER NAME OR NAMES AS THE GOVERNORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (AND IN THIS SCHEME ARE REFERRED TO AS “RESIDENT/S”).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 26 November 1962 : Standard registration
- 16 April 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUTTON'S HOSPITAL IN CHARTERHOUSE
CHARTERHOUSE SQUARE
LONDON
EC1M 6AN
- Phone:
- 02072539503
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window