ST CHRISTOPHER'S FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ST CHRISTOPHER'S PROVIDES SAFE, CARING AND INNOVATIVE SUPPORT SERVICES FOR A WIDE VARIETY OF VULNERABLE PEOPLE INCLUDING YOUNG RUNAWAYS, CHILDREN IN RESIDENTIAL CARE AND FOSTER CARE, CARE LEAVERS AND YOUNG HOMELESS PEOPLE. THROUGH OUR WORK WE AIM TO HELP THEM OVERCOME THEIR DISADVANTAGES AND ACHIEVE BRIGHTER FUTURES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£16,635,000
Donations and legacies | £425.00k | |
Charitable activities | £16.17m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £41.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£19,418,000
Raising funds | £529.00k | |
Charitable activities | £18.85m | |
Other | £39.00k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,665,261 from 138 government contract(s) and £209,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £568.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.85m |
People

337 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Isle Of Man
Governance
- 17 November 1962: Standard registration
- ST CHRISTOPHERS (Working name)
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Bradley- Fortune | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Merryn Elizabeth Hockaday | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monique Margaret Turpin | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lady Anne Kristine Mackintosh Stoneham | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliane Christine Wesemann | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Markiewicz | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Peter Duff | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Halliwell | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Akua Doreen Akonor | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Veronica Dooley | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joe Anichebe BA HONS | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jennifer Anne Dakin | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.99m | £18.18m | £18.22m | £18.09m | £16.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.44m | £18.22m | £18.18m | £18.66m | £19.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.67m | £9.63m | £9.15m | £8.85m | £6.67m | |
|
Income from government grants | £177.00k | £365.00k | £323.06k | £255.00k | £209.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £169.00k | £299.00k | £251.00k | £476.00k | £425.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.81m | £17.81m | £17.96m | £17.60m | £16.17m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.00k | £2.00k | £0 | £18.00k | £41.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £67.00k | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £5.00k | £11.10k | £209.82k | £13.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £18.14m | £17.80m | £17.90m | £18.29m | £18.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £296.00k | £346.00k | £272.00k | £360.00k | £529.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.30k | £35.08k | £61.25k | £79.47k | £70.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £4.00k | £71.00k | £5.00k | £14.00k | £39.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.90m | £8.21m | £10.08m | £9.72m | £9.55m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £6.02m | £6.88m | £5.16m | £5.63m | £3.09m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£4.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.11m | £6.27m | £6.40m | £6.51m | £6.59m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/1936 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/06/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 SEP 2017 as amended on 13 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1.1.1 TO ASSIST PEOPLE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, AND FOR SUCH PURPOSES TO ESTABLISH, EQUIP, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE HOMES AND HOSTELS AND OTHER CENTRES FOR THE ACCOMMODATION OR RESIDENCE OR USE OR BENEFIT OF SUCH PEOPLE TO PROVIDE OR ARRANGE FOR THE PROVISION OF FOSTERING SERVICES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER SERVICES IN CONNECTION WITH ANY OF THE FOREGOING AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE; 1.1.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY; AND 1.1.3 TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 17 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Christophers Fellowship
1 Putney High Street
London
SW15 1SZ
- Phone:
- 02087807800
- Email:
- info@stchris.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window