Financial history MIGRAINE ACTION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 207783
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £278.13k £155.27k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £261.44k £173.69k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0