MIGRAINE ACTION ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness by the promotion of scientific research on the subject of migraine and other headache disorders and the advancement of public education on the subject of migraine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 15 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE BRITISH MIGRAINE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE MIGRAINE ACTION ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.13k | £155.27k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.44k | £173.69k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 22 February 2018 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 22 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 1960 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 1971 AND 8 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROMOTION OF SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH ON THE SUBJECT OF MIGRAINE AND OTHER HEADACHE DISORDERS (HEREINAFTER COLLECTIVELY REFERRED TO AS "MIGRAINE"): AND 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION ON THE SUBJECT OF MIGRAINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window