YWCA CENTRAL CLUB (1931)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 November 1962: Standard registration
- 12 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YWCA CENTRAL CLUB (Working name)
- YOUNG WOMEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION CENTRAL CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JULY 1931 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 23 MAY 1979, AND 11 JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
CLUB FOR GIRLS AND WOMEN PARTICULARLY THOSE ENGAGED ON BUSINESS AND THE PROFESSIONS IN LONDON TO BE CARRIED ON IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPALS OF Y.W.C.A. THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL SPIRITUAL MORAL INTELLECTUAL AND PHYSICAL WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS AND TO DEVELOP AMONG THEM THE SPIRIT OF MUTUAL SERVICE AND THE SERVICE OF OTHERS ON A BASIS OF CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP.
Area of benefit
LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window