BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF BLUES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance to pupils or former pupils of Christ's Hospital who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 July 1962: Standard registration
- B S B (Working name)
- BLUES SUPPORTING BLUES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Wilkes | Chair | 30 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Jennie Barwise | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eyre | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Howgego | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Crick | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Williams | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Treharne | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Ann White | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.68k | £177.23k | £162.45k | £111.67k | £173.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.04k | £137.62k | £152.54k | £140.95k | £147.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 292 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SOCIETY FORMED BY RESOLUTION 1824. SCHEME OF 9 NOVEMBER 1966. RULES AND REGULATIONS AS AMENDED 20 DECEMBER 1982, 28 JANUARY 1985, 24 JANUARY 1994, 20 JANUARY 1997, 6 JUNE 2000, 14 JANUARY 2003, 20 JANUARY 2005 AND 10 JANUARY 2008. as amended on 10 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST BLUES, THEIR PARENTS, SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY WAY OF, OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF, ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING:- (A) ALLOWANCES, PECUNIARY OR OTHER GIFTS, GRANTS, INTEREST-FREE LOANS, ACCOMMODATION OR MATERIAL GOODS (B) GRANTS OR INTEREST-FREE LOANS FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES OR FOR OTHER CAREER DEVELOPMENT PURPOSES FOR PERSONS WHO WERE EDUCATED AT CHRIST'S HOSPITAL (C) SUPPORT GRANTS FOR TRAVELLING OR OTHER PURPOSES FOR PUPILS AT CHRIST'S HOSPITAL, AND ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN ACTIVATES OF A SPORTING, CULTURAL OR ACADEMIC NATURE (D) GRANTS OR INTEREST-FREE LOANS TO ENABLE PERSONS EDUCATED AT CHRIST'S HOSPITAL TO UNDERTAKE PROJECTS OF A LIMITED PERIOD THAT ARE LIKELY TO ASSIST IN THEIR CAREER OR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT (E) FUNDS TO ENABLE CHILDREN TO BE EDUCATED AT CHRIST'S HOSPITAL WHO ARE CLOSE RELATIONS OR DEPENDANTS OF A PERSON WHO WAS EDUCATED AT CHRIST'S HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COUNTING HOUSE
CHRISTS HOSPITAL
HORSHAM
RH13 0YP
- Phone:
- 01403247418
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window