BROOKE FUND FOR ANIMALS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 18 July 1962: Standard registration
- 14 November 2002: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 November 2002: Funds transferred to 1085760 THE BROOKE HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS
- BROOKE HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS, CAIRO (Previous name)
- THE BROOKE HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSIONER'S SCHEME OF 21ST MAY 1991 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23 JULY 1999 AND SCHEME DATED 28TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
(A)TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF EQUIDS AND OTHER ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN ANIMAL HOSPITALS OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (B)TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE CARE AND WELFARE OF ANIMALS AND IN THE TREATMENT OF SICK ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
THE "AREA OF BENEFIT" MEANS ANY AREA OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM BUT WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE MIDDLE EAST, INDIA AND PAKISTAN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.