THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RSC is an international charity and professional body that connects chemical scientists with each other and society as a whole. We develop and celebrate professional capabilities. We publish new research, bring people together to spark new ideas and partnerships, and support teachers to inspire future generations. We speak up to influence the people making decisions that affect us all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£70,858,000
Donations and legacies | £474.00k | |
Charitable activities | £67.63m | |
Other trading activities | £759.00k | |
Investments | £1.76m | |
Other | £227.00k |
Total expenditure:
£85,114,000
Raising funds | £1.59m | |
Charitable activities | £83.52m | |
Other | £0 |
£6,202,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £84,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.59m | |
Charitable expenditure | £83.52m |
People

735 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
2091 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 75 |
£70k to £80k | 47 |
£80k to £90k | 25 |
£90k to £100k | 11 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 4 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 3 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- China
- Germany
- India
- Japan
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- CHEMICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Magdalena Titirici FRSC | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander W F Reip BSc MSc CChem FRSC FIMMM | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rehana Sidat BSc CSci CChem FRSC | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen J Byard BSc CSci CChem FRSC | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Aline F Saiani nee Miller BSc PhD FRSC | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Edwin C Constable MA DPhil CChem FRSC | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor David M Smith BA PhD CChem FRSC | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Mokaya OBE FRSC | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Remya Norris MChem CChem MRSC | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Cooke MRSC | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard F W Jackson MA PhD CChem FRSC | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jeremy K M Sanders CBE MA PhD ScD FRSC FRS | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annette Doherty OBE FRSC | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Christopher Oxley BSc MBA CChem FRSC CMgr FCMI | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gallery-Strong BSc MSc CSci CChem FRSC | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.25m | £64.80m | £63.68m | £65.97m | £70.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.68m | £64.29m | £64.46m | £72.07m | £85.11m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £411.00k | £115.00k | £190.00k | £98.00k | £84.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £579.00k | £184.00k | £588.00k | £497.00k | £474.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £593.00k | £124.00k | £49.00k | £406.00k | £759.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £65.00m | £63.54m | £62.21m | £64.03m | £67.63m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £367.00k | £56.00k | £62.00k | £293.00k | £158.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.08m | £890.00k | £805.00k | £975.00k | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Other | £4.00k | £56.00k | £19.00k | £69.00k | £227.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £89.00k | £10.00k | £162.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £64.02m | £63.05m | £62.53m | £70.58m | £83.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.66m | £1.23m | £1.93m | £1.49m | £1.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £333.00k | £338.00k | £356.00k | £347.00k | £409.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £360.00k | £600.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £772.00k | £625.00k | £1.51m | £712.00k | £563.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.43m | £5.76m | £5.02m | £4.53m | £4.48m | |
|
Long-term investments | £108.23m | £116.96m | £122.95m | £111.02m | £102.97m | |
|
Other assets | £34.95m | £37.41m | £36.81m | £36.75m | £29.50m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£29.83m | -£39.99m | -£27.16m | -£14.41m | -£9.87m | |
|
Total liabilities | £27.20m | £30.01m | £30.20m | £34.44m | £28.98m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 15 MAY 1980.
Charitable objects
GENERAL ADVANCEMENT OF CHEMICAL SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- BOC (GASES DIVISION) TRUST
- CENTENARY FUND
- CORDAY-MORGAN MEDAL AND PRIZE FUND
- CORDAY-MORGAN MEMORIAL FUND
- EDWARD FRANK HARRISON TRUST FUND
- ETHEL BEHRENS FUND
- FARADAY DIVISION
- FARADAY LECTURE FUND
- HARRY JEPHCOTT FUND
- JOHN JEYES LECTURESHIP
- LIVERSIDGE LECTURE FUND
- PEDLER LECTURE FUND
- PUBLICATIONS FUND
- R A ROBINSON MEMORIAL FUND
- RESEARCH FUND
- ROBERT JOHN FLINTOFF TRUST
- ROBERT ROBINSON LECTURE FUND
- ROBERT WOOD FUND
- SIMONSEN LECTURE FUND
- SPECIAL PUBLICATIONS FUND
- SPIERS' MEMORIAL FUND
- THE BOURKE LECTURE MEDAL AND PRIZE FUND
- THE MARLOW MEDAL AND AWARD FUND
- THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY BENEVOLENT FUND
- THE RSC RECOGNITION FUND
- THE SPIERS MEMORIAL MEDAL AND PRIZE FUND
- TILDEN LECTURE FUND
- 03 September 1976 : Standard registration
- 04 March 2020 : Removed
- 04 March 2020 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY
BURLINGTON HOUSE
PICCADILLY
LONDON
W1J 0BA
- Phone:
- 01223420066
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window