CATHERINE FLOYER AND FRANCIS FLOYER

Charity number: 207907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GIFTS AT CHRISTMAS TIME TO ELDERLY IN VILLAGE AND GRANTS TO OTHER IN THE VILLAGE IN NEED

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £303
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRANCIS FLOYER (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAJOR THOMAS PATRICK EDWARD BARCLAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £164 £159 £155 £189 £303
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 April 2022 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 18 APRIL 1884
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRENT PELHAM
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
BEECHES MANOR
BRENT PELHAM
BUNTINGFORD
SG9 0HJ
Phone:
01279777254
Website:

No information available