CONDICOTE POOR'S LAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fuel is ordered by the trustees and delivered to the beneficiaries. The trustees pay the provider where solid fuel is not used a cheque for the equivalent amount is issued to beneficiaries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 August 1962: Standard registration
- POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen Wellman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Houghton Smith | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADAM RICHARD FLEMING | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Christine Wynn | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER NORMAN FORMBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600 | £600 | £0 | £564 | £582 | |
|
Total expenditure | £606 | £638 | £440 | £550 | £540 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD OF 19TH FEBRUARY 1778 PR 21 P.173
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FUEL FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
CONDICOTE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RYDAL HOUSE
CONDICOTE
CHELTENHAM
GL54 1ES
- Phone:
- 01451830389
- Email:
- rogerformby@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window