THE DUNTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 207931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of small grant to needy individuals living in the parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £129
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Elizabeth Lavelle Trustee 19 October 2022
DUNTON COMMUNITY GARDEN GROUP
Received: On time
DAVID TANT Trustee 19 June 2012
None on record
ANN WHITBY Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA HUMBERSTONE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £120 £123 £125 £128 £129
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 JANUARY 1969
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF DUNTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.PRIOR TO SCHEME OF 9 JANUARY REGISTERED UNDER 205239.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DUNTON
Registration history
  • 21 June 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 Cambridge Road
Dunton
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 8RS
Phone:
01767316948
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available