HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As before, our prime objective is to provide services, help & activities for the 60+ age group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Ronald Botterill Mr | Chair | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Kocen | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Jeffrey Webster | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Esmee Purdie | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.51k | £9.31k | £49.05k | £70.08k | £84.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.72k | £27.85k | £46.91k | £66.64k | £112.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1ST JUNE 1958
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF 60 AND PERSONS SUFFERING FROM INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT OR POVERTY WITHIN THE AREA OF THE HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB.
Area of benefit
HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB
Contact information
- Address:
-
136A Willifield Way
LONDON
NW11 6YD
- Phone:
- 02084586352
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window