ROYAL NORFOLK VETERANS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 207983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our association was formed in Norwich in 1898 to raise funds to rescue from the workhouse or a paupers grave any soldier sailor or marine, and to grant pecuniary aid to the widow of a deceased member of the association. we still adhere to those principles albeit in a modified form to this day funds permitting, the membership approve the grants to be awarded to those members in ill health .

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £300
Total expenditure: £439

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RALPH EDWIN MEEHAN Chair
None on record
Andrew Hugh Evans Trustee 29 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £71 £500 £250 £250 £300
Total expenditure £265 £190 £165 £165 £439
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 August 2024 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 November 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
189 Norwich Road
Wroxham
NORWICH
NR12 8RZ
Phone:
01603738809
Website:

No information available